IL SB1866 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Crime Victims Compensation Act. Provides procedures for providing notice to a vendor waiting for payment of a claim for compensation filed under the Act. Provides that a vendor who has been provided notice of the claim may not engage in debt collection activities against the applicant until the Court of Claims awards compensation for the debt and the payment is processed. Provides that if the court denies compensation, the vendor may not engage in debt collection activities until 45 days after the date the court enters an order denying the compensation. Provides that the vendor may engage in specified activities. Provides that the statute of limitations for collection of a related debt is tolled upon the filing of the claim for compensation and any related civil actions are stayed until 45 days after the Court of Claims enters an order denying the compensation. Defines terms.
Title
CRIME VICTIMS-DEBT COLLECTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-21 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0444 |
2015-08-21 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-08-21 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-000-000 |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2015-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |