IL SB1865 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Credit for Prior Learning Act. Requires each public university to submit its policies and procedures for students to earn credit for prior learning to the Board of Higher Education for review and approval and each community college to submit its policies and procedures for students to earn credit for prior learning to the Illinois Community College Board for review and approval. Provides that, at a minimum, these procedures shall include a listing of the types of documentation acceptable and the dates of inclusion for which prior learning is acceptable. Requires the Board of Higher Education and the Illinois Community College Board to adopt rules to permit public higher education institutions to award credit for prior learning after the assessment of prior learning experiences for documented learning that demonstrates achievement of all terminal objectives for a specific course or courses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CREDIT FOR PRIOR LEARNING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rose
2017-04-27SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 010-000-000
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2017-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 012-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback