IL SB1864 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-12 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Smoke Free Illinois Act. Includes the use of alternative nicotine products and electronic cigarettes in the definition of "smoke" or "smoking". Defines "electronic cigarette", "nicotine", and "tobacco product". Amends the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Minors and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. Provides that "alternative nicotine product" does not include electronic cigarettes. Effective January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SMOKE FREE ILLINOIS-E-CIG

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2019-11-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-11-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-11-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-11-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-11-07HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-11-06HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-10-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-10-29HouseFirst Reading
2019-10-29HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-10-29HouseArrived in House
2019-10-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
2019-10-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-011-000
2019-10-29Senate3/5 Vote Required
2019-10-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-10-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Link
2019-10-29SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-10-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-10-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-10-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 29, 2019
2019-10-28SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2019-10-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019
2019-07-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2019-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-003-000
2019-05-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-02SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 10, 2019
2019-04-12SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-05SenateDo Pass Public Health; 012-000-000
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4108210Amended CodeCitation Text
7206751.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback