IL SB1856 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Prevailing Wage Act. Provides that if the Department of Labor ascertains the prevailing rate of wages for a public body, the public body may satisfy the Act's notice by newspaper publication and mail requirements by posting on the public body's website a hyperlink to the prevailing wage schedule that is published on the official website of the Department of Labor. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PREVAILING WAGE-WEBSITE POST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bivins
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 015-000-000
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Labor; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Labor
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8201309Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback