IL SB1846 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0238
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0238
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires the Department of Public Health to promulgate rules and regulations to include asthma in the standard school health examination. Makes conforming changes. Amends the Illinois Health Statistics Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to collect and maintain data on the extent, nature, and impact of asthma and the determinants of asthma. Makes conforming changes.
Title
SCH/HEALTH STATS-ASTHMA
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0238 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 520 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |