IL SB1843 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Provides that a court considering the petition of an interested person to appoint a special prosecutor shall presume, without demonstration from the petitioner, a conflict of interest on behalf of any State's Attorney not exclusively assigned to cases in which the defendant or defendants are members of any law enforcement agency, when the underlying charges concern misconduct allegedly committed by the officer during the performance of official duties, while in uniform, while on duty, or after announcing his or her status as a law enforcement officer. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PETITION-SPECIAL PROSECUTOR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-24SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0319
2017-08-24SenateEffective Date August 24, 2017
2017-08-24SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 053-000-000
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2017-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2017-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-08HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-08HouseArrived in House
2017-05-05SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-000-000
2017-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Raoul
2017-05-05SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 007-003-000
2017-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5553-9008Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1843&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1843.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1843eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1843enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0319.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1843sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1843sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1843ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1843ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1843_05052017_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1843_05312017_036000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1843_05312017_132000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback