IL SB1842 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0527
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0527
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that when a person has been identified as having 5 (rather than 3) or more prescribers or 5 (rather than 3) or more pharmacies, or both, that do not utilize a common electronic file for controlled substances within the course of a 6-month (rather than continuous 30-day) period, the Prescription Monitoring Program may issue an unsolicited report to the prescribers, dispensers, and their designees informing them of the potential medication shopping. Provides that specified requirements also apply to opioid treatment programs that are licensed or certified by the Department of Human Services' Division of Substance Use Prevention and Recovery and are authorized by the federal Drug Enforcement Administration to prescribe Schedule II, III, IV, or V controlled substances for the treatment of opioid use disorders. Requires opioid treatment programs to attempt to obtain written patient consent, document attempts to obtain the written consent, and not transmit information without patient consent. Provides that the documentation obtained shall not be utilized for law enforcement purposes. Provides that treatment of a patient shall not be conditioned upon his or her written consent. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CONTROLLED SUBSTANCES-OPIOIDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0527 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; 017-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Healthcare Access and Availability; 007-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Healthcare Access and Availability |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 314.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |