IL SB1842 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. In the statutes concerning aggravated kidnaping, aggravated assault, aggravated battery, and unlawful use of weapons, deletes references to "hooded" and replaces with "cloth" so that the offense is committed when the person commits the proscribed act when he or she wears a cloth, robe, or mask to conceal his or her identity. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-CLOTH-CONCEAL ID
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0318 |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Effective Date August 24, 2017 |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-05-30 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-05-25 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 10-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-3.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |