IL SB1840 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0581
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0581
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Community Benefits Act. Provides that the Act applies to all nonprofit and public hospitals licensed under the Hospital Licensing Act or operated under the University of Illinois Hospital Act (rather than not applying to a hospital operated by a unit of government, a hospital located outside of a metropolitan statistical area, or a hospital with 100 or fewer beds). Requires community benefits plans to describe activities the hospital is undertaking to address health equity, reduce health disparities, and improve community health. Provides that, in order to increase transparency and accessibility of charity care and financial assistance data, the Attorney General shall post on the Attorney General's website: all community benefits plans contained in reports submitted by hospitals; and a compiled report that summarizes information from completed community benefits plans. Provides that an electronic version of the compiled report shall be sent to the Governor and each member of the General Assembly. Provides a late filing fee for nonprofit hospitals for community benefits plans of $2,500 per month that the report is late (rather than $100). Makes other changes. Amends the Hospital Uninsured Patient Discount Act. Provides that a hospital, other than a rural hospital or a Critical Access Hospital, shall provide a discount from charges to specified uninsured patients for all medically necessary health care services exceeding $150 (rather than $300) in any one inpatient admission or outpatient encounter. Provides for civil monetary penalties of $1,000 to $5,000 (rather than $500) for a violation. Requires the Attorney General to publish an annual report that outlines complaints received related to hospital uninsured discount programs and financial assistance applications. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
HOSPITALS-FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0581 |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Health; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Health |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 27, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Executive Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-05-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Health; 011-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 015-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported Back To Health; 004-001-000 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-03-16 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Public Health |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 76 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 76 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 76 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 76 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 76 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 76 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 89 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 89 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 89 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 89 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |