IL SB1838 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities and community college districts in Illinois. Allows universities and community colleges to establish a digital discount program that complies with federal regulations. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-DIGITAL DISCOUNT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 3-42.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1838&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1838.htm |