IL SB1829 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning licensure of educators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-06-16SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-28SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-03-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105521B-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback