IL SB1828 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-4)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Needle and Hypodermic Syringe Access Program Act. Provides that persons or entities that promote scientifically proven ways of mitigating health risks associated with drug use and other high-risk behaviors may establish and operate a needle and hypodermic syringe access program. Provides objectives for programs established under the Act. Includes language requiring programs to provide specified services. Provides that no employee or volunteer of or participant in a program shall be charged with or prosecuted for possession of specified substances. Provides that law enforcement officers who in good faith arrest or charge a person entitled to immunity under the Act shall not be subject to civil liability for the arrest or filing of charges. Provides that prior to commencing operations under the Act, an organization shall report specified information to the Department of Public Health. Amends the Alcoholism and Other Drug Abuse and Dependency Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall give preference for grants and proposals to specified drug overdose prevention programs. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall conduct an evidence-based treatment needs assessment to be submitted to the General Assembly by December 31, 2019. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NEEDLE AND HYPODERMIC ACCESS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0356
2019-08-09SenateEffective Date August 9, 2019
2019-08-09SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-25SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-05-27SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-011-000
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 016-000-000
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-003-000
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush
2019-04-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-001-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-03-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019
2019-03-12SenateDo Pass Public Health; 007-001-000
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-05SenatePostponed - Public Health
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2030125-13New CodeSee Bill Text
203015-23Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback