IL SB1825 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nathan D. Reitz
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall evaluate eligibility of special districts for State and federal programs, grants, and subsidies based on eligibility requirements set forth in their statutory charters. Amends the Kaskaskia Regional Port District Act. Provides that the Port District has power to apply for and accept grants, loans, or appropriations from the federal and State government (currently, only federal government) or any agency or instrumentality thereof, to be used for any of the purposes of the District and to enter into agreements with the federal and State government (currently, only federal government) in relation to such grants, loans or appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCEO-PORT DISTRICTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nathan D. Reitz
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2019-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-27HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2019-03-27HouseArrived in House
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2060546.41Amended CodeCitation Text
20605605-30Amended CodeCitation Text
70183018Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback