IL SB1822 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that, if a redevelopment plan is for a qualifying transit facility located within a transit facility improvement area and the applicable project is subject to the process for evaluation of environmental effects under the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969, then a housing impact study need not be performed. Provides that, for a transit facility improvement area established prior to, on, or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the following apply: (i) defines "redevelopment project costs"; and (ii) provides that specified provisions regarding tax increment allocation financing for a redevelopment project area located in a transit facility improvement area shall apply only to the lots, blocks, tracts, and parcels of real property that are located within the boundaries of such redevelopment project area and not to the lots, blocks, tracts and parcels of real property that are located outside the boundaries of such redevelopment project area. Provides that, on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the following provisions apply to transit facility improvement areas, and to redevelopment project areas located in a transit facility improvement area, established prior to, on, or after the effective date of the amendatory Act: a redevelopment project area established within a transit facility improvement area whose boundaries satisfy specified requirements shall be deemed to satisfy specified contiguity requirements, regardless of whether all of the parcels of real property included in the redevelopment project area are adjacent to one another, and this applies through and including the completion date of the redevelopment project located within the transit facility improvement area established and the date of retirement of obligations issued to finance redevelopment project costs. In provisions concerning municipal powers and duties in redevelopment project areas, provides that the various powers and duties described applying to a redevelopment project area shall also apply to a transit facility improvement area established either prior to or after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Extends the dates of completion of various redevelopment project areas. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TIF-CITY OF PEORIA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2021-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2021-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2021-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-001-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-001-000
2021-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler
2021-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2021
2021-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2021-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-004-000
2021-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2021-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
2021-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2021-05-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-007-000
2021-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000
2021-05-13HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2021-05-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-05-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-05-04HouseFirst Reading
2021-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2021-04-30HouseArrived in House
2021-04-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2021-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
2021-04-15SenateDo Pass Revenue; 008-000-000
2021-03-24SenatePostponed - Revenue
2021-03-09SenateAssigned to Revenue
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-74.4-3.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1822&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1822.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1822eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1822enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1822ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1822ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1822_04292021_013000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB1822_05302021_029000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1822ham002_05312021_013001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1822ham001_05312021_013000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback