IL SB1819 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Requires each public official who, on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, is elected or appointed to office to complete an 8-hour continuing education program established by the Community College Board within 2 years after the date he or she is first elected or appointed, on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, to that office and every 2 years thereafter for as long as he or she remains a public official. Authorizes a fine to be levied against a public official who fails to timely complete the continuing education requirement. Prohibits a public official from being elected or appointed to public office if he or she fails to timely pay the fine and complete the required continuing education.
Title
PUBLIC OFFICIAL-CONTINUING ED
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2013-02-28 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 10-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 10-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 7-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 8-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 50-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 7-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 h | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | Art. 7 heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1819&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB1819.htm |