IL SB1819 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Increases the maximum liability of a renter of a vehicle for damages resulting from loss due to theft of the vehicle from $2,000 to the actual and reasonable costs incurred up to the fair market value of the vehicle immediately before the loss occurred, as calculated by a commonly and commercially accepted method to establish a fair market value. Effective January 1, 2012.
Title
VEH CD-RENTAL CAR INSURANCE
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-305.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1819&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB1819.htm |