IL SB1818 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the Community Association Manager Licensing and Disciplinary Act. Makes conforming changes in the Regulatory Sunset Act and the State Finance Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION MANAGER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Althoff
2017-04-27SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
225427ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
301055.742Repealed CodeCitation Text
5804.30Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback