IL SB1817 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the Appraisal Management Company Registration Act. Makes conforming changes in the Real Estate Appraiser Licensing Act of 2002. In the Real Estate Appraiser Licensing Act of 2002, removes a provision requiring written disclosure to a borrower or loan applicant of the total compensation to the appraiser or appraisal firm when an appraisal obtained through an appraisal management company is used for loan purposes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

APPRAISAL MANAGEMENT COMPANIES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22545810-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2254585-5Amended CodeCitation Text
225459ActRepealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback