IL SB1814 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that beginning in fiscal year 2019 and each year thereafter, the System shall calculate the projected amount of increase in benefits, expressed as a percentage of salary and reflecting separate amounts for Tier 1 and Tier 2 members, resulting from any increase in salary over the preceding school year, expressed as a percentage of salary. Provides that if the amount of a teacher's salary for any school year beginning on or after July 1, 2018 exceeds the member's annual full-time salary rate with the same employer for the previous school year, then the teacher's employer shall pay to the System the current value of the projected amount of the increase in benefits, as determined by the System and reflecting whether the teacher is a Tier 1 or Tier 2 member, resulting from the increase in the member's salary over the previous school year. Excludes earnings increases paid to members under contracts or collective bargaining agreements entered into, amended, or renewed before the effective date of the amendatory Act. Defines "Tier 1 member" and "Tier 2 member". Repeals the definition of "Tier 1 member" added by Public Act 98-599, which has been held unconstitutional. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-EMPLOYER CONTRIBUTIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LA)
2017-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-05-22SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (LA)
2017-05-22SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.41New CodeSee Bill Text
40516-106.4Repealed CodeCitation Text
40516-106.4aNew CodeSee Bill Text
40516-106.4bNew CodeSee Bill Text
40516-158Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback