IL SB1814 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0425
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0425
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Exempts from an eavesdropping violation, with prior notification to the State's Attorney of the county in which it is to occur, recording or listening with the aid of any device to any conversation where a law enforcement officer, or any person acting at the direction of law enforcement, is a party to the conversation and has consented to it being intercepted or recorded under circumstances where the use of the device is necessary for the protection of the law enforcement officer or any person acting at the direction of law enforcement, in the course of an investigation of a felony offense involving any weapon listed in the statute concerning unlawful use of weapons. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-EAVESDROPPING-EXEMPT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-13 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0425 | |
2009-08-13 | Effective Date August 13, 2009 | |
2009-08-13 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-05-18 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-18 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-02 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-001 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-001 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Millner |