IL SB1811 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TELEHEALTH ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
2017-05-26SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-25SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-25SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-002
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-05-22HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 016-000-000
2017-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-05-05HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Althoff
2017-04-27SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
225601Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1811&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1811.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1811eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1811enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1811sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1811sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1811ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1811_04272017_048000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1811_05242017_013000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1811_05312017_044000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback