IL SB1809 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012, the Unified Code of Corrections, and the County Jail Act. Permits currently employed and retired State correctional officers and county correctional officers to carry their own firearms off duty without being in violation of the unlawful use of weapons and aggravated unlawful use of a weapon statutes if they meet certain training requirements. Deletes provision exempting from the unlawful use of weapons statute and the aggravated unlawful use of a weapon statute athlete's possession, transport on official Olympic and Paralympic transit systems established for athletes, or use of competition firearms sanctioned by the International Olympic Committee, the International Paralympic Committee, the International Shooting Sport Federation, or USA Shooting in connection with such athlete's training for and participation in shooting competitions at the 2016 Olympic and Paralympic Games and sanctioned test events leading up to the 2016 Olympic and Paralympic Games.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CORRECTIONAL OFFICER-FIREARMS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Firearms
2017-03-29SenateTo Subcommittee on Firearms
2017-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Firearms
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720524-2Amended CodeCitation Text
73012526.1New CodeSee Bill Text
73053-2-12New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback