IL SB1806 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides that the Illinois Gaming Board shall not grant an application to become a licensed video gaming location if the Board determines that granting the application would more likely than not cause a terminal operator licensed video gaming location to operate the video gaming terminals in 2 or more licensed video gaming locations as a single video gaming operation. Provides factors to be considered by the Board in determining restrictions on licenses in malls. Provides that the Board shall presume that the granting of an application to become a licensed video gaming location within a mall will cause a terminal operator to operate the video gaming terminals in 2 or more licensed video gaming locations as a single video gaming operation if the Board determines that granting the license would create a local concentration of licensed video gaming locations. Provides that a home rule municipality, or a home rule county with respect to unincorporated portions of the county, may impose separate requirements on video gaming that provide sources of municipal or county revenue or impose limitations on video gaming that are more restrictive than those provided under the Act. Provides that all current supplier licensees under the Riverboat Gambling Act shall be entitled to licensure under the Video Gaming Act as manufacturers, distributors, or suppliers without additional Board investigation or approval, except by vote of the Board; however, they are required to pay application and annual fees under the Video Gaming Act. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GAMING-LICENSE RESTRICTIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Gaming; 010-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Gaming
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Gaming
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateChief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2304025Amended CodeCitation Text
2304027Amended CodeCitation Text
2304080Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback