IL SB1805 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Provides that, in determining whether to grant an owners license to an applicant, the Illinois Gaming Board shall consider the extent to which the ownership of the applicant includes veterans of service in the armed forces of the United States, and the good faith affirmative action plan of each applicant to recruit, train, and upgrade veterans of service in the armed forces of the United States in all employment classifications. Requires the Board, by rule, to establish goals for the award of contracts by each owners licensee to businesses owned by veterans of service in the armed forces of the United States, expressed as percentages of an owners licensee's total dollar amount of contracts awarded during each calendar year. Provides criteria for the Board to consider when setting the goals. Requires each owners licensee to file with the Board an annual report of its utilization of veteran-owned businesses during the preceding calendar year, which shall include a self-evaluation of the efforts of the owners licensee to meet the goals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GAMING-CONTRACTS-VETERANS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-05-29HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-23HouseTo Gaming Subcommittee
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Gaming; 011-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Gaming
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Gaming
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
230107Amended CodeCitation Text
230107.6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback