IL SB1804 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Removes provisions concerning the distribution of certain funds into the Horse Racing Equity Fund. Removes provisions limiting the civil penalties that the Illinois Gaming Board may impose on licensees for violations of the Act at up to $5,000 for individuals and up to $10,000 or an amount equal to the daily gross receipts, whichever is larger. Amends the Video Gaming Act. Changes the non-refundable license application fee for terminal handlers from $50 to $100. Adds provisions providing that the non-refundable license application fee for a licensed establishment, licensed truck stop establishment, licensed fraternal establishment, or licensed veterans establishment shall be $100.
Title
GAMING-PENALTIES/FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-23 | House | To Gaming Subcommittee |
2017-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Syverson |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommend Do Adopt Gaming; 013-000-000 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Gaming |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Gaming; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Gaming |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Gaming |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Gaming |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Gaming |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Gaming |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 10 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 10 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |