IL SB1804 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Removes provisions concerning the distribution of certain funds into the Horse Racing Equity Fund. Removes provisions limiting the civil penalties that the Illinois Gaming Board may impose on licensees for violations of the Act at up to $5,000 for individuals and up to $10,000 or an amount equal to the daily gross receipts, whichever is larger. Amends the Video Gaming Act. Changes the non-refundable license application fee for terminal handlers from $50 to $100. Adds provisions providing that the non-refundable license application fee for a licensed establishment, licensed truck stop establishment, licensed fraternal establishment, or licensed veterans establishment shall be $100.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GAMING-PENALTIES/FEES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays
2017-05-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-05-23HouseTo Gaming Subcommittee
2017-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Syverson
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommend Do Adopt Gaming; 013-000-000
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Gaming
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-03-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 4 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Gaming; 011-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Gaming
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Gaming
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Gaming
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Gaming
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Gaming
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2301013Amended CodeCitation Text
230105Amended CodeCitation Text
2304045Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1804&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1804.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1804eng.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1804sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1804sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1804sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1804sam004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1804sam005.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1804ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1804ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1804ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1804_04272017_045000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback