IL SB1799 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that on and after January 1, 2019, a detention screening instrument shall be used for referrals to all authorized juvenile detention facilities in this State prior to a judicial hearing. Provides a minor alleged to be a delinquent minor taken into temporary custody must be brought before a judicial officer within 48 hours (rather than 40 hours, excluding Saturdays, Sundays and court designated holidays). Provides that if an appearance is required of any minor taken and held in a place of custody or confinement operated by the State or any of its political subdivisions, including counties and municipalities, the chief judge of the circuit may permit by rule for the minor's personal appearance to be made by means of two-way audio-visual communication, including closed circuit television and computerized video conference, in the following proceedings: the initial appearance before a judge; a detention or shelter care hearing; or any status hearing. Amends the Probation and Probation Officers Act. Provides that the Division of Probation Services of the Supreme Court shall adopt a statewide juvenile detention screening instrument that has been verified through evidence-based and data-based practices that is to be used by all authorized juvenile detention facilities. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-DETENTION SCREENING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054055-410Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-415Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-420New CodeSee Bill Text
73011015Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback