IL SB1798 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that an expatriate corporation shall be considered a non-resident bidder for purposes of the Code. Provides that no business or member of a unitary business group shall submit a bid for or enter into a contract with a State agency under the Code if the business is an expatriate corporation. Defines "expatriate corporation". Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that notwithstanding provisions of the Act, any person formed or incorporated in a foreign tax haven may be a member of a unitary business group without regard to where its business activities are conducted. Defines "foreign tax haven". Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires the Illinois Investment Policy Board to make its best efforts to identify all expatriate companies and include those companies in the list of restricted companies distributed to each retirement system and the Illinois State Board of Investment.
Title
EXPATRIATE CORP/FOREIGN HAVEN
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] |
Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed May 9, 2017 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Verified |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hastings |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hastings |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-005-000 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-005-000 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-004-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 1-15.120 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 45-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 50-17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 1501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-110.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |