IL SB1796 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois School Student Records Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STUDENT ONLINE PROTECTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-015-001
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 009-001-000
2017-05-24HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2017-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-08HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-05-08HouseArrived in House
2017-05-05SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-04-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-07SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback