IL SB1795 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Limited Liability Company Act. Provides that the statutory fiduciary duties a member owes to a member-managed company and its other members do not limit any fiduciary duties owed at common law. Removes a provision requiring a member to discharge his or her duties to a member-managed company and its other members under the Act or under the operating agreement and to exercise any rights consistent with the obligation of good faith and fair dealing. Instead provides that the implied contractual covenant of good faith and fair dealing applies to the operating agreement and members of a member-managed company in the same manner and to the same extent that it applies at law to other contracts and parties to the contracts. Makes changes concerning the extent to which an operating agreement of a limited liability company may restrict or eliminate a fiduciary duty owed at common law or under the Act. Makes other changes.
Title
LLC ACT-FIDUCIARY DUTIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0230 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-001 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported Back To Judiciary; 002-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | To Judiciary- Business Entities |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 180 | 15-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 15-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |