IL SB1792 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In provisions concerning hearings before the board of review or the Property Tax Appeal Board, provides that the complainant or appellant shall make timely disclosure to the assessor and the board or review or Property Tax Appeal Board, as applicable, of all relevant evidence or information known to the complainant or appellant, including, in cases where a change in assessed valuation over $300,000 is sought, all appraisals prepared in anticipation of filing a complaint or appeal. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-COMPLAINT-DISCLOSURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Re-assigned to Revenue |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 16-170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 16-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1792&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1792.htm |