IL SB1790 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Provides that a pharmacist may refill a patient's prescription without prescriber authorization if the pharmacist is unable to contact the prescriber after reasonable effort, a failure to refill the prescription may result in an interruption of therapeutic regimen or create patient suffering, the pharmacist informs the prescriber at the earliest convenience of the emergency refills, and the prescription is not for a controlled substance. Provides that prescriptions may be refilled pursuant to the provisions for a period of time reasonably necessary for the pharmacist to secure prescriber authorization. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PHARMACY-EMERGENCY REFILLS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0237
2017-08-18SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-20SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-22SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 016-000-000
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Stadelman
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 012-000-000
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 012-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled in Licensed Activities and Pensions; Stadelman
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2258515.3New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback