IL SB1786 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall create and maintain an online database and resource page on its website. Provides that the database and resource page shall contain mental health resources specifically geared toward post-secondary social workers, counselors, parents, faculty, graduate assistants, school administrators, graduate and undergraduate students, and support personnel with the goal of connecting those people with mental health resources related to crisis services, wellness, sexual health, survivor support, gender-based violence, nutrition, stress reduction, anxiety, depression, violence prevention, suicide prevention, and substance use and encouraging information sharing among educational administrators, security personnel, resource officers, faculty, students, and all other employees of a university or college. Effective immediately.
Title
MHDDAA-MENT HLTH DATABASE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0228 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Effective Date July 30, 2021 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-000 |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-06 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 016-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Murphy |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Behavioral and Mental Health; 011-000-000 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Behavioral and Mental Health; 011-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |