IL SB1786 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
Pending: House Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the License to Work Act. Deletes language providing that all notices sent to a person involved in an administrative proceeding shall state that failure to satisfy any fine or penalty shall result in the Secretary of State suspending his or her driving privileges, vehicle registration, or both. Provides that the Secretary is authorized to cancel any license or permit if the holder failed to pay any fees owed to the Secretary for the license or permit (rather than failure to pay any fees, civil penalties owed to the Illinois Commerce Commission, or taxes due upon reasonable notice and demand). Provides that a person whose driver's license was canceled, suspended, or revoked under certain circumstances shall have his or her driving privileges reinstated. Deletes language providing that the reporting requirements for public officials shall apply to a truant minor in need of supervision, an addicted minor, or a delinquent minor whose driver's license has been suspended. Provides for the immediate revocation of the license, permit, or driving privileges of any driver if the driver was convicted of a misdemeanor relating to a motor vehicle if the person exercised actual physical control over the vehicle during the commission of the offense. Provides that the Secretary is authorized to suspend or revoke the driving privileges of any person without a preliminary hearing if the person has been convicted of criminal trespass to vehicle if the person exercised actual physical control over the vehicle during the commission of the offense. Provides that in order to be subject to suspension or revocation for violation of specific provisions of the Liquor Control Act of 1934, a person must also be an occupant of a motor vehicle at the time of the violation. Deletes language authorizing the Secretary to suspend or revoke the driving privileges of a person without a preliminary hearing for specific adjudications or violations. Deletes language providing that the owner of a registered vehicle that has failed to pay any fine or penalty due and owing as a result of 10 or more violations shall have his or her driving privileges suspended. Repeals Sections concerning the suspension of a driver's license for theft of motor fuel and suspension of driving privileges for failure to satisfy fines or penalties for toll violations or evasions. Effective July 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-LICENSE TO WORK ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-04-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-04-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-04-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-04-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2019-04-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-04-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2019-04-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-04-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-04-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-02HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-03-28HouseArrived in House
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 038-010-000
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass Transportation; 018-000-000
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to Transportation
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-208.3Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-704.2Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-201Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-204Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-205Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-205.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
62556-206Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-209.1New CodeSee Bill Text
62556-306.5Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-306.7Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback