IL SB1785 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that members of the General Assembly and the offices of Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Attorney General, Secretary of State, Comptroller, and Treasurer shall be elected by ranked-choice voting. Provides for ranked-choice ballots to be produced. Provides that voters may rank their choice for candidates for those offices and provides for interpretations of certain ballot marks. Provides that tallying ranked-choice votes proceeds in rounds. Provides that in each round, the number of votes for each continuing candidate must be counted, that each continuing ballot counts as one vote for its highest-ranked continuing candidate for that round, and that exhausted ballots are not counted for any continuing candidate. Provides that if only 2 candidates remain, the candidate with the higher vote total wins, and that if more than 2 candidates remain, the last-place candidate is eliminated and another round of tallying is to commence. Provides that rounds continue until a winner is found. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-RANKED CHOICE VOTING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2022-02-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2022-02-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Executive- Elections
2022-02-07SenateTo Executive- Elections
2022-01-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2022-01-05SenateRe-assigned to Executive
2021-07-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2021-05-21SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-05-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2021-05-11SenateRe-assigned to Executive
2021-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021
2021-05-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-04-30SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021
2021-04-29SenateRe-assigned to Executive
2021-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
2021-04-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2021-04-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2021-04-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2021-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2021-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2021-03-24SenateTo Executive- Elections
2021-03-16SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-03-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1051-3Amended CodeCitation Text
10516-3Amended CodeCitation Text
10516-4.2New CodeSee Bill Text
10517-11Amended CodeCitation Text
10517-18Amended CodeCitation Text
10517-18.2New CodeSee Bill Text
10518-5Amended CodeCitation Text
10518-9Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback