IL SB1785 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Medicaid rates for supportive living services on and after July 1, 2019 must be equal to 60% of the average total nursing facility services per diem for the geographic areas defined by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services. Provides that for supportive living facilities specializing in dementia care, the rate must be 72% instead of 60%. Requires the Medicaid rates for supportive living services to be updated whenever the total nursing facility service per diems are updated. Requires the Department to delink the per diem rate paid for supportive living facility services from the per diem rate paid for nursing facility services, effective for services provided on or after May 1, 2011 through June 30, 2019 (rather than effective for services provided on or after May 1, 2011). Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-SUPPORTIVE FACILITIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5.01a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5e | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1785&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1785.htm |