IL SB1784 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 27 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides for the election of members to the Chicago Board of Education beginning with the 2024 general election (rather than beginning on November 5, 2024). Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. Makes changes concerning the appointment of Board members by the Mayor. Specifies that Board members shall serve without any compensation (but shall be reimbursed for expenses). With respect to nominating petitions, changes a date from the March 15, 2022 election to the 2024 general primary election. In provisions related to the independent financial review and report commissioned by the Board, requires the report to be submitted no later than October 31, 2022 (rather than June 30, 2025); requires the State Board of Education to submit its recommendations based on the report to the General Assembly by no later than July 1, 2023. With respect to the creation of electoral districts, requires the electoral districts to be drawn on or before July 1, 2023 (rather than February 1, 2022). Amends Public Act 102-177 to add an immediate effective date for provisions added to the School Code concerning a moratorium on school closings, consolidations, and phase-outs. Effective June 1, 2022, except that the provision amending Public Act 102-177 is effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION-MODEST SPORT UNIFORM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-27 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-24SenateSent to the Governor
2021-10-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-10-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor
2021-10-27SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-10-27SenateSenate Concurs
2021-10-27SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 043-014-000
2021-10-27SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 3/5 Vote Required
2021-10-27SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 043-014-000
2021-10-27SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 3/5 Vote Required
2021-10-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-10-27SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-10-27SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-10-27SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-10-27SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert F. Martwick
2021-10-27SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-10-27SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert F. Martwick
2021-10-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - October 27, 2021
2021-10-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2021-10-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-10-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-033-000
2021-10-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-10-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-10-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-006-000
2021-10-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2021-10-22HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-10-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2021-10-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-10-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
2021-10-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-10-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-10-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-10-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-10-22HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-10-19SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Robert F. Martwick
2021-10-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-10-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2021-06-02HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
2021-05-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-006-000
2021-05-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2021-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris
2021-05-13HouseCommittee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021
2021-04-28HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy
2021-04-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-001-000
2021-03-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2021-03-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2021-03-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2021-03-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-03-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021
2021-03-16SenateDo Pass Education; 014-000-000
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2021-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor
2021-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2021-03-09SenateAssigned to Education
2021-03-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.73New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-21.9New CodeSee Bill Text
110305120New CodeSee Bill Text
110520100New CodeSee Bill Text
1106605-210New CodeSee Bill Text
11066510-210New CodeSee Bill Text
11067015-210New CodeSee Bill Text
11067520-215New CodeSee Bill Text
11068025-210New CodeSee Bill Text
11068530-220New CodeSee Bill Text
11069035-215New CodeSee Bill Text
1108053-29.14New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1784&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1784.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1784eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1784enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1784sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1784ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1784ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1784_04212021_031000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB1784_10272021_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1784ham002_10272021_008001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1784ham001_10272021_008000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback