IL SB1783 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Sponsor Removed Sen. Melinda Bush
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Prevailing Wage Act. Provides that the transportation of ready-mixed concrete and aggregate materials shall be deemed to be employment upon public works. Includes additional trucking related activities within the scope of the Act. Includes in the calculation of the prevailing wage rate, rental costs for trucks and equipment provided by owner-operators. Defines terms. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PREVAILING WAGE TRUCKING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-27SenatePostponed - Executive
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-21SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-03-20SenatePostponed - Executive
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-03-12SenateRe-assigned to Executive
2019-03-12SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-03-06SenatePostponed - Labor
2019-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Labor
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8201302Amended CodeCitation Text
8201303Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback