IL SB1781 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-06 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Enterprise Zone Act. Provides that a business that intends to establish a new utility-scale solar power facility may apply for a high impact business designation. Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Increases the long-term renewable procurement plan goals after the 2025 delivery year. Requires the long-term renewable procurement plan to include the procurement of new renewable energy credits. Provides that the Adjustable Block program shall be designed to be continuously open. Authorizes utilities to recover certain costs related to the Adjustable Block program. Excludes certain costs from a limitation on the costs of the Adjustable Block program. Makes other changes concerning the Adjustable Block program. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Requires the Illinois Commerce Commission to open a proceeding to update the interconnection standards and applicable utility tariffs. Requires the Commission to revise certain standards for interconnection based on specified criteria. Establishes an interconnection working group. Makes changes to provisions concerning net metering and the distributed generation rebate. Requires the Commission, in consultation with the Illinois Power Agency, to study and produce a report analyzing the potential for and barriers to the implementation of energy storage in Illinois. Requires the Agency to include a plan to procure energy from energy storage resources as part of its procurement plan for 2021. Extends a provision concerning a review, reconciliation, and true-up associated with renewable energy resources' collections and costs. Makes other changes. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to authorize emergency rulemaking. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RENEWABLE ENERGY-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-21SenatePostponed - Energy and Public Utilities
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2038551-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2038551-56Amended CodeCitation Text
2038551-75Amended CodeCitation Text
206555.5Amended CodeCitation Text
220516-107.5Amended CodeCitation Text
220516-107.6Amended CodeCitation Text
220516-107.7New CodeSee Bill Text
220516-108Amended CodeCitation Text
220516-111.5Amended CodeCitation Text
51005-45Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback