IL SB1781 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Extends the inoperative clause date for a pilot program in Cook County waiving the fee to be paid for a petition to expunge or seal records of arrests resulting in release without charging or arrests or charges not initiated by arrest resulting in acquittal, dismissal, or conviction when the conviction was reversed or vacated. Extends inoperative date to on and after January 1, 2019 (rather than on and after January 1, 2018). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM ID-EXPUNGEMENT FEE WAIVER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026305.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback