IL SB1779 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Fire Marshal Act. Provides that the Office of the State Fire Marshal shall administer grants (currently, General Revenue Fund grants) to areas not located in a fire protection district or in a municipality which provides fire protection services, to defray the organizational expenses of forming a fire protection district. Amends the Law Enforcement and Fire Fighting Medal of Honor Act. Provides that members of the Fire Fighting Medal of Honor Committee shall serve without compensation but shall be reimbursed for actual expenses incurred in the performance of their duties from funds appropriated to the Office of the State Fire Marshal (currently, Office of the Governor) for such purpose. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE FIRE MARSHAL-GRANTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-01-30SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-01-24SenateRe-assigned to State Government
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - State Government
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2029052Amended CodeCitation Text
2039853001Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback