IL SB1778 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Finance Authority Act. In Sections concerning the fire truck revolving loan program, the fire station revolving loan program, and the ambulance revolving loan program, provides that repayments of loans made under those programs (and interest on those moneys) may be retained by the Authority and used for the purposes for which they are otherwise authorized to be used (currently, deposited into the Fire Truck Revolving Loan Fund, the Fire Station Revolving Loan Fund, and the Ambulance Revolving Loan Fund, as applicable). Provides that a loan for the purchase of an ambulance may not exceed $200,000 (instead of $100,000).
Title
IFA-FIRE TRUCKS
Sponsors
Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Re-assigned to State Government |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3501 | 825-80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3501 | 825-81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3501 | 825-85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1778&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1778.htm |