IL SB1775 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Creates the Municipal Task Force on Recycling Strategies to Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions to review the status of municipal policies and programs that reduce greenhouse gas emissions nationally and internationally. Provides that the review shall include, but not be limited to, specified greenhouse gas initiatives. Provides that the Task Force shall prepare a report that summarizes its work and makes recommendations resulting from its review. Provides that the Task Force shall submit the report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly no later than one year after the effective date. Contains provisions concerning the membership of the Task Force. Provides that the members of the Task Force shall be appointed no later than 90 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that the provisions creating and concerning the Task Force shall be repealed 2 years after the effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI-GREENHOUSE GAS TASK FORCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-26SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-06-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-06-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-06-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2017-06-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-06-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-06-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-05-28HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-28HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-000-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-08HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-05-08HouseArrived in House
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-05SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
2017-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Harmon
2017-05-05SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2017-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Environment and Conservation
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2017-03-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 009-000-000
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-19-15New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback