IL SB1774 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Comprehensive Lead Education, Reduction, and Window Replacement Program Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LEAD-CLEAR-WIN PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0461
2017-08-25SenateEffective Date August 25, 2017
2017-08-25SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 053-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2017-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-039-000
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-05-30HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-05-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-05-16HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-11HouseArrived in House
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 007-001-000
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2017-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
410431Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1774&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1774.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1774eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1774enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0461.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1774sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1774sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1774ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1774ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1774_05102017_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1774_05302017_031000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1774_05312017_106001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1774_05312017_106000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback