IL SB1774 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Justice Information Authority Act. Provides that the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority shall enter into a contract with the Illinois Law Enforcement Alarm System ("ILEAS") to represent local law enforcement agencies in Illinois in the application process for local law enforcement equipment grants emanating from either State or federal sources. Requires ILEAS to (i) establish, manage, and implement a unified grant application process and clearinghouse for local Illinois law enforcement equipment grants and (ii) to manage the distribution of these grant funds within the guidelines as established by law and by each individual grant. Requires the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority to provide ILEAS with the appropriate management and administrative funds provided in each grant to defray the costs of the management of this grant system.
Title
CJIA-EQUIPMENT GRANTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-12 | Postponed - Criminal Law | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Millner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1774&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1774.htm |