IL SB1773 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-10-17 - House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Hearing: Oct 24 @ 3:00 pm in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision permitting a nursing facility to appeal a change in its Minimum Data Set rate, provides that the facility shall be permitted to offer any and all additional documentation during the appeal hearing that is necessary to refute the State's findings (rather than the facility may not offer any additional documentation during the appeal hearing, but may identify documentation provided during the on-site review that may support a specific area of documentation deemed deficient by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUB AID-STATUS OF PAYMENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-10-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-16HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-08HouseArrived in House
2017-05-05SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Public Health; 003-000-000
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Long Term Care
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Public Health
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Public Health
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5.4gAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback