IL SB1765 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0225
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0225
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that each State agency shall establish the goal of increasing diversity on interview panels in order to increase State employment opportunities provided to women, minority persons, and persons under specified employment plans. Provides that each State agency shall use in the interview process, if possible, persons that are representative of specified persons if the interview being conducted meets specified criteria. Requires each State agency to submit an annual report to the Department of Central Management Services. Provides for the content of the report.
Title
CMS-INTERVIEW DIVERSITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0225 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-003-000 |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |