IL SB1762 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Freedom to Work Act. Expands the scope of the Act to apply to all employees (currently applies only to low-wage employees). Prohibits all covenants not to compete.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FREEDOM TO WORK ALL EMPLOYEES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Labor
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Labor
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Labor
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Labor
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8209010Amended CodeCitation Text
820905Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback