IL SB1761 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a non-violent sexual advance, nor the discovery, knowledge, or perception of a person's sex or sexual orientation, including under circumstances in which the defendant and victim dated or had a romantic or sexual relationship, cannot be mitigating factors relevant to the imposition of the death penalty for first degree murder (no effect unless the death penalty is reinstated for the offense). Also provides that the same conduct does not constitute serious provocation for second degree murder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-SEXUAL ORIENTATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-19HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-08HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-08HouseArrived in House
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-05SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Biss
2017-05-05SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-001
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-03-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 007-002-002
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72059-1Amended CodeCitation Text
72059-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback