IL SB1760 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that if the Department of State Police fails to either approve or deny an application for a Firearm Owner's Identification Card within 30 days from the date it is received, the applicant may file, in the circuit court of the judicial circuit in which the applicant resides, a complaint for mandamus to compel a decision on the application. Provides that if the applicant prevails, he or she shall be entitled to all costs, fees, and damages. Provides that the applicant shall also be entitled to punitive damages of $1,000 per day commencing on the 31st day that the application has not been approved. Provides that for the purposes of this Act, the Department shall be considered to have received an application when either the Department or anyone acting as its agent or on its behalf receives a completed application with the required fee.
Title
FIREARM OWNERS ID-APPROVAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2013 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Firearms |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1760&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB1760.htm |